+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 17
January 19, 2017: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor