+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 27-2-1-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2018: H05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
February 21, 2018: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2018: S06 - Travel
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 27-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor