+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S postponed indefinitely
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2019: S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
January 29, 2019: S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
James
Type:
Primary Sponsor