+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0078
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0078
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0078
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0078
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- H10 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to H02
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor