+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0011
- Assigned Chapter Number 27
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed SEA No. 0011
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0011
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0011
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- H Placed on General File
- H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
February 11, 2019: S Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
February 6, 2019: H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2019: S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Agar
Type:
Primary Sponsor