+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0073
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0073
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0073
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0073
- 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 18, 2017: S09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor