+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 177 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0079
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0079
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0079
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0079
- Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
- Placed on General File
- COW Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2015: Education
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 27, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Education
- Yeas: 5