+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0021
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0021
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0021
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (5)
February 29, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2016: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 9
February 22, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 17, 2016: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
February 12, 2016: Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30