+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
- Received for Introduction
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned