+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Died in Committee
- H03 Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with HR 5-4
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
- Received for Introduction
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed COW
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned