+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0051
- Assigned Chapter Number 106
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- S President Signed SEA No. 0051
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0051
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0051
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- H Placed on General File
- H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
- S Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2022: H 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
March 10, 2022: S Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
March 4, 2022: H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
February 23, 2022: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2022: S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Boner
Type:
Primary Sponsor