+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 23-7-0-0-0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 21, 2018: S10 - Labor
- Yeas: 5
February 14, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 23-7-0-0-0
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7