+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 70 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0029
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0029
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0029
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1