+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0034
- Assigned Chapter Number 76
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0034
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 40-12-8-0-0
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0034
- S President Signed SEA No. 0034
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 40-12-8-0-0
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 12
March 3, 2020: H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2020: H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 5
February 14, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2020: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 10, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor