+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 153 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0072
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0072
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0072
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0072
- Adopted SF0081JC001: 55-4-1-0-0
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0081JC001: 26-2-2-0-0
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concur:Failed 2-28-0-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- COW Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 2015: Adopted SF0081JC001
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Adopted SF0081JC001
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 28
February 24, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 29, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
January 22, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1