+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 183 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0082
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0082
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0082
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0082
- Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
- Placed on General File
- Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2015: Agriculture
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 28, 2015: Agriculture
- Yeas: 5