+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0005
- Assigned Chapter Number 19
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0005
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- S President Signed SEA No. 0005
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0005
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2020: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
February 17, 2020: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 11, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor