+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:H Did not consider for COW
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 24-5-1-0-0
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2020: H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 26, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
February 14, 2020: S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 11, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 24-5-1-0-0
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Ellis
Type:
Primary Sponsor