+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- H COW:Failed 19-39-2-0-0
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2022: H COW:Failed 19-39-2-0-0
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 39
March 3, 2022: H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 23, 2022: S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2022: S Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Case
Type:
Primary Sponsor