+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned