+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- H No report prior to CoW Cutoff
- H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
- S Received for Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2022: H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 4
March 7, 2022: H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 4
February 18, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
February 16, 2022: S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Corporations
Type:
Primary Sponsor