+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- postponed indefinitely
- Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
- Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 24-5-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 9
March 6, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
February 23, 2018: COW
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 23, 2018: COW
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 23
February 22, 2018: S05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 5
February 16, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 24-5-1-0-0
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor