+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0026
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0026
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0026
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0026
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
- Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned