+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0038
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0038
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0038
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0038
- 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-2-0-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2016: H08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2016: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5
February 10, 2016: Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2