+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0002
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0002
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0002
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0002
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- H06 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Do Pass
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
- Received for Introduction
+ − Sponsor
Joint Travel, Recreation, Wildlife and Cultural Resources Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor