+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Did Not Consider in COW
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor