+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0075
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0075
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0075
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0075
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H12 Recommended Do Pass
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H12
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S12
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Management Council
Type:
Primary Sponsor