+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0056
- Assigned Chapter Number 117
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed SEA No. 0056
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0056
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0056
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
April 1, 2021: S Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2021: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2021: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Cooper
Type:
Primary Sponsor