+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0056
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0056
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0056
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0056
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to H02
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
- Received for Introduction
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor