+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0088
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0088
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0088
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0088
- Did Concur
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned