+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0067
- Assigned Chapter Number 150
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0067
- S President Signed SEA No. 0067
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0067
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
- S Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (11)
March 12, 2020: S Adopted SF0061JC001: 28-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 28
March 12, 2020: H Adopted SF0061JC001: 35-22-3-0-0
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
March 10, 2020: S Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
- Nays: 30
March 9, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2020: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2020: H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
February 21, 2020: Amendment adopted 29-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2020: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 4
February 14, 2020: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 10, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Water
Type:
Primary Sponsor