+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0042
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0042
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0042
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to H02
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor