+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- H No report prior to CoW Cutoff
- H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-0-0-0
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Laid Back
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2021: H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-0-0-0
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
March 5, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
March 1, 2021: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor