+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed 3rd Reading
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor