+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0022
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0022
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0022
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0022
- 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- COW:Passed
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 10, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 13, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5