+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0078
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0078
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0078
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0078
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor