+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 194 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0089
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0089
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0089
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0089
- Adopted SF0057JC001: 48-9-3-0-0
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0057JC001: 26-1-3-0-0
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concur:Failed 0-27-3-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
- COW Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
March 6, 2015: Adopted SF0057JC001
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
March 6, 2015: Adopted SF0057JC001
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Concur
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 19, 2015: Education
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
January 19, 2015: Education
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Joint Appropriations Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor