+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0055
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0055
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0055
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0055
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concur:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 21
February 27, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 14, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 31, 2017: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2