+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0074
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0074
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0074
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0074
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Do Pass
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor