+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 16, 2018: S05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 5
February 13, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Select Water Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor