+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0058
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0058
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0058
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0058
- Did Concur
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction