+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 17, 2019: S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Anderson
Type:
Primary Sponsor