+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- S03 - Revenue:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2018: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2018: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 5
February 12, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 22-7-1-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Revenue Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor