+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 134 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0050
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
- Placed on General File
- Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2015: Corporations
- Yeas: 9
January 29, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2015: Corporations
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor