+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S03 - Revenue
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2017: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 31, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2017: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor