+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Appointed JCC02 Members: Representative(s) Blake, McKim, Wilson
- Did Not Adopt SF0045JC01
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0045JC01
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members: Representative(s) Blake, McKim, Wilson
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members: Senator(s) Von Flatern, Landen, Schiffer
- Did Not Concur
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Joint Transportation, Highways and Military Affairs Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor