+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0039
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0039
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0039
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0039
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction