+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0026
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0026
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0026
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0026
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Select Committee on Local Government Financing
Type:
Primary Sponsor