+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0060
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0060
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0060
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0060
- Adopted SF0042JC002: 41-19-0-0-0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0042JC002: 27-2-1-0-0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
- Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Did Not Adopt SF0042JC001: 21-37-2-0-0
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0042JC001: 30-0-0-0-0
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (10)
March 4, 2016: Adopted SF0042JC002
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
March 3, 2016: Adopted SF0042JC002
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: Did Not Adopt SF0042JC001
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Adopted SF0042JC001
- Yeas: 30
February 26, 2016: Concur
- Nays: 30
February 26, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2016: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 9, 2016: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 5
February 8, 2016: Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections & Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor