+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0065
- Assigned Chapter Number 152
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0065
- S President Signed SEA No. 0065
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0065
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Laid Back
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
February 25, 2019: S Concur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 15, 2019: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 7
January 29, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
January 25, 2019: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Steinmetz
Type:
Primary Sponsor